Brooks, Peter John (CPSO#: 42650)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Sep 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cleveland Clinic Foundation
A-41
9500 Euclid Avenue
Cleveland OH  44195
United States
Phone: 216-444-4284

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Ohio

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER JOHN BROOKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROOKS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1984