Broomfield, Joel Alan Scott (CPSO#: 86406)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Apr 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
RSM Durham Regional Cancer Centre
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G2B9
Phone: 9055768711 Ext. 5441
Fax: 9057216101
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joel Broomfield Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Broomfield ( CPSO# 86406 )

Business Address:
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6

Business Address:
RSM Durham Regional Cancer Centre
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 14 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOEL ALAN SCOTT BROOMFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROOMFIELD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 25 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 26 Mar 2010 to 25 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 26 Mar 2011 to 25 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 26 Mar 2012 to 25 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 26 Mar 2013 to 13 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Jul 2014
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2016