Broomhead, Frank Arthur (CPSO#: 22902)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Dec 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Frank Broomhead Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 27 2006

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 2005