Brooymans, Corinne Ann Mary (CPSO#: 57132)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 121
1200 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 3C3
Phone: (416) 431-3800
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brooymans Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Brooymans ( CPSO# 57132 )

Business Address:
121 - 1200 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 3C3
Phone Number: (416) 431-3800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CORINNE ANN MARY BROOYMANS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROOYMANS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1987