Broski, Anthony Peter (CPSO#: 57181)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Mar 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Renal Clinic
3rd Floor Walker Complex
1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 43513
Fax: (905) 641-5218
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony Broski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Broski ( CPSO# 57181 )

Business Address:
Renal Clinic - 3rd Floor Walker Complex
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 684-7271

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 03 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY PETER BROSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROSKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1988