Brosky, Gerald Morris (CPSO#: 30732)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1979 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Aug 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 2000