Brouillard, Daniel Dominique (CPSO#: 58545)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Apr 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
460 Princess St.
Kingston ON  K7L 1C2
Phone: (613) 544-0555
Fax: (613) 546-4487
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 22 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL DOMINIQUE BROUILLARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROUILLARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Rheumatology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 1992