Brow, James Rigg (CPSO#: 22964)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1960
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jan 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012