Browman, George Paul (CPSO#: 30024)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 18 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009