Brown, Adrian Richard Huw (CPSO#: 62381)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
204-701 Sheppard Ave E
Toronto ON  M2K 2Z3
Phone: (416) 546-1350
Fax: (647) 349-1870
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adrian R.H. Brown Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Brown ( CPSO# 62381 )

Business Address:
204 - 701 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2Z3
Phone Number: (416) 456-1350

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADRIAN RICHARD HUW BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1991