Brown, Alan Earl (CPSO#: 53406)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jan 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jan 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
568 ROSECLIFFE TERRACE
London ON  N6K3X8
Phone: 519-472-9078
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 18 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALAN EARL BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 1987