Brown, Allan (CPSO#: 59323)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dufferin Steeles Family Medical
Centre
1881 Steeles Avenue West Unit #2
Toronto ON  M3H 5Y4
Phone: (416) 665-2900
Fax: (416) 665-2021
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Allan Brown Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Brown ( CPSO# 59323 )

Business Address:
Dufferin Steeles Family Medical Centre
Suite 2
1881 Steeles Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3H 5Y4
Phone Number: (416) 665-2900

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLAN BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1989