Brown, Bryce Kendall (CPSO#: 83556)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
Intensive Care Unit
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bryce Brown Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Brown ( CPSO# 83556 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
Intensive Care Unit
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRYCE KENDALL BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 25 Jul 2005 to 14 Aug 2005
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006