Brown, Carl James (CPSO#: 73300)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 08 Mar 1999 to 02 May 1999
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 14 Jan 2002 to 10 Mar 2002
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Colorectal Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Colorectal Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 7 - Colorectal Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Colorectal Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 May 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Mar 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jun 2006