Brown, Charlotte Elizabeth Anne (CPSO#: 71453)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Dec 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Maple Family Health Team
After Hours Clinic
Kingston Centre, 1036 Princess St
Kingston, ON K7L 1H2
Kingston ON  K6V 1S8
Phone: (613) 531-5888
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elizabeth A. Brown Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Brown ( CPSO# 71453 )

Business Address:
1036 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1H2
Phone Number: (613) 531-5888

Business Address:
449 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1C2
Phone Number: (613) 539-5473

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 08 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLOTTE ELIZABETH ANNE BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 1999