Brown, Ciara Eithne (CPSO#: 89059)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Newcastle-Upon-Tyne, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dundas East Medical Office
600 Dundas Street East
Suite 4
Belleville ON  K8N 5P9
Phone: 613-779-8869
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Refined MedSpa
283 Philburn Rd.
Belleville ON  K8N 4Z5
Canada
Phone: 613-966-8116
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mitchell Spencer Brown Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Brown ( CPSO# 89059 )
Dr. M. Brown ( CPSO# 87599 )

Business Address:
Belleville General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400


Corporation Name: Ciara Brown Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Brown ( CPSO# 89059 )

Business Address:
283 Philburn Road
Belleville ON  K8N 4Z5
Phone Number: (613) 966-8116

Business Address:
Bayview Mall Medical Offices
Suite 50
470 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 1G1
Phone Number: (613) 966-4045

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CIARA EITHNE BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2012