Brown, David Ross Garbutt (CPSO#: 67264)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 04 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1993
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Aug 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Aug 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Aug 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1996
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Aug 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jun 2004