Brown, Donald Stephen (CPSO#: 33325)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
Room 3404B
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 761-5001
Fax: (613) 761-5367
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Stephen Brown Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Brown ( CPSO# 33325 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
Room 3404-B
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-5001

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONALD STEPHEN BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1981 to 15 Jun 1982
Other - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 5 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Sep 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1992
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 20 Nov 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2013