Brown, Gerald (CPSO#: 23585)

Current Status: Expired: Member deceased as of 14 Dec 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Dec 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 07 Sep 2011

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2011
Expired: Member deceased. Expiry date: 14 Dec 2017