Brown, Glenn Donald (CPSO#: 33821)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Nov 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Nov 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
220 Bagot Street
P O Box 8888
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Phone: (613) 533-9303
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Family Medicine
Queen's University
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3G2
Canada
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Glenn D. Brown Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Brown ( CPSO# 33821 )

Business Address:
220 Bagot Street
P O Box 8888
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Phone Number: (613) 533-9300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 08 Dec 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GLENN DONALD BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1982