Brown, Helen Rosamond Lees (CPSO#: 52358)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Nov 1963 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1984
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Mar 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011