Brown, Holly Alexis (CPSO#: 64733)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Mar 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Mar 1993


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Doctors' Lounge Mailbox
Rockyview General Hospital
7007 - 14 Street South West
Calgary AB  T2V 1P9
Phone: 403-244-1731

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. HOLLY ALEXIS BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 1993