Brown, Isabella Patricia (CPSO#: 19611)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Sep 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1946

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1963
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Oct 1963
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1993