Brown, James Eldon Jay (CPSO#: 15306)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: Brown, Eldon James (used until: 27 Nov 1990 )

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jan 1960 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1955
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Aug 1987