Brown, Jennifer Ida Marion (CPSO#: 62767)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 12 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 May 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jun 2009