Brown, Karen Ann (CPSO#: 50210)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Apr 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Apr 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Anaesthesia
Montreal Children's Hospital
1001 Decarie Blvd
Montreal QC  H4A 3J1
Phone: (514) 412-4400 Ext. 24888

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 20 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN ANN BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 1987