Brown, Meaghan Lise (CPSO#: 93053)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: Mahler, Meaghan Lise (used until: 26 Aug 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
353 Pitt Street
Cornwall ON  K6J 3R1
Phone: (613) 936-0306
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Meaghan Brown Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 11 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Brown ( CPSO# 93053 )

Business Address:
353 Pitt Street
Cornwall ON  K6J 3R1

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEAGHAN LISE BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2013