Brown, Michael Gordon (CPSO#: 33755)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Jul 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jul 1995