Brown, Michael Peter (CPSO#: 71620)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 May 2005