Brown, Mijin (CPSO#: 70016)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Dec 2000

Summary

Former Name: Cho, Mijin (used until: 11 Dec 2000 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Cvic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 58439
Fax: (905) 494-6569
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

William Osler Health System
Peel Memorial
20 Lynch St
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Canada
Phone: 905-494-2120 Ext. 58439
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Stephen & Mijin Brown Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Brown ( CPSO# 70016 )
Dr. S. Brown ( CPSO# 68332 )

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (416) 494-2120

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 494-2120

Business Address:
20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIJIN BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2000