Brown, Morton Leonard (CPSO#: 21693)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jan 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 328, 1333 Sheppard Ave E Toronto, ON M2J 1V1
Instructions: Please contact Dr. David Hajec
Date Received: 27 Jun 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 22 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jan 2017