Brown, Norman Neil (CPSO#: 63752)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 29 Aug 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: August 31, 2009
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective August 31, 2009, Dr. Norman Neil Brown has undertaken to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario to participate in a comphrehensive practice assessment prior to practising medicine in Ontario and to abide by any recommendations flowing from that assessment.