Brown, Peter Joseph Irvin (CPSO#: 31440)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 May 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 May 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UNUM
1 Fountain Square
Chattanooga TN  37402
United States
Phone: (423) 294-8016
Fax: (416) 813-6461

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Tennessee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER JOSEPH IRVIN BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Apr 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 1980