Brown, Peter Maurice (CPSO#: 33310)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Victory 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-3232 Ext. 4732
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter M. Brown Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Brown ( CPSO# 33310 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Victory 3 - 76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-2573

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 10 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER MAURICE BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Transplantation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Transplantation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982