Brown, Robert Alan (CPSO#: 32660)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 26 Oct 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Oct 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 27 May 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1981
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 26 Oct 1993