Brown, Robert (CPSO#: 33017)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Sep 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Sep 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Public Service Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Dec 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Sep 2000