Brown, Robyn Juni (CPSO#: 59594)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Oct 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Maple Key Clinic
Unit D2
1036 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1H2
Phone: (613) 546-9721
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robyn Brown Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Brown ( CPSO# 59594 )

Business Address:
Maple Key Clinic
Unit D2
1036 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1H2
Phone Number: (613) 546-9721

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBYN JUNI BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1989