Brown, Russell James (CPSO#: 52947)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 19 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1998