Brown, Stanley Edward (CPSO#: 26738)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Dec 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
105-641 Commissioners Rd. E
London ON  N6C 2T9
Phone: (519) 686-8585
Fax: (519) 686-8580
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 13 Mar 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STANLEY EDWARD BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1973 to 14 Jun 1974
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1974 to 30 Jun 1975
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 May 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 1997