Brown, Thomas Arthur (CPSO#: 33827)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Rochester, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 03 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Aug 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1999