Browne, Charmaine Fleurette (CPSO#: 70984)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 05 Feb 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Feb 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of the West Indies, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 05 Feb 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 06 Feb 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 05 Feb 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 06 Feb 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 05 Feb 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Feb 2000