Browne, Gregory Noel (CPSO#: 75728)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Apr 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Apr 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 05 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 8 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Apr 2005