Browne, Heather Elizabeth (CPSO#: 58570)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: Langlotz, Heather Elizabeth (used until: 14 Jun 2006 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 29 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Aug 1992
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009