Browning, Andrew Don (CPSO#: 60726)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305
1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 728-5311
Fax: (705) 728-5601
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Browning Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Browning ( CPSO# 60726 )

Business Address:
305 - 1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 728-5311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW DON BROWNING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWNING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1990