Brownlee, Carolyn Joy (CPSO#: 65292)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CF Health Services Centre Ottawa
Montfort Hospital
Wing D
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K2
Phone: (613) 945-1468
Fax: (613) 945-1467
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carolyn Brownlee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Brownlee ( CPSO# 65292 )

Business Address:
CF Health Services Centre Ottawa
Montfort Hospital Wing D
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K2
Phone Number: (613) 945-1468

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLYN JOY BROWNLEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWNLEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993