Brozek, Jan Ludwik (CPSO#: 94862)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Feb 2011

Expiry Date:  27 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 28 Feb 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Jagiellonian University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Health Sciences Centre
HSC 2C19
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 525-9140 Ext. 22936
Fax: (905) 524-3841
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Poland

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 28 Feb 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Oct 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 27 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 26 Oct 2015 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Jan Ludwik Brozek may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine
                        and Clinical  Epidemiology  and Biostatistics, McMaster University,
                        in which Dr. Brozek holds an  academic  appointment  at the rank of
                        Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr.  Brozek no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

            This  certificate  is  issued on October 26, 2015, and currently has an interim
            expiry date of June 27,  2018.   The  expiry  date  of  this certificate may be
            extended, subject to the limitations in paragraph 2 above.