Bruce, Andrew Watt (CPSO#: 17676)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1947

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 20 May 1964 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1960
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Apr 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008