Bruce-Houle, Gwen Geraldine (CPSO#: 67228)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Sep 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Sep 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Sep 2006