Brule, Michele Fleurette Mercia (CPSO#: 56734)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 401
65 Larch Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 1B8
Phone: (705) 673-8391
Fax: (705) 673-7330
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Brule Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 15 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Brule ( CPSO# 56734 )

Business Address:
Suite 401
65 Larch Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 1B8
Phone Number: (705) 673-8391

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 12 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELE FLEURETTE MERCIA BRULE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRULE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1989