Brunetta, Jason Michael (CPSO#: 74743)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Dec 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Dec 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 501
14 College Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1K2
Phone: (416) 465-0756
Fax: (416) 465-8344
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON MICHAEL BRUNETTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRUNETTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2003